Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Enrico (Ernesto) Mazzella

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1833Born
22 Sep 185522.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 188754.0AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
20 Mar 188754.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
14 Oct 189764.6DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

MicroData Summary for Enrico (Ernesto) Mazzella
Archbishop Enrico (Ernesto) Mazzella (born , died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVitulano, Archdiocese of Benevento
Ordained BishopGesu, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 141
  • c34: CB, 21 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast