Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Guillaume de Maupeou

Deceased

Bishop of Lombez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1680¹BornParis
16 Jun 172141.4AppointedBishop of Lombez, France
13 Jul 172141.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lombez, France
17 Feb 175171.1DiedBishop of Lombez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Guillaume de Maupeou:
Bishop Charles-Guillaume de Maupeou (born 1680, died ) Bishop of Lombez

  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 250
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015