Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Maguire, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1721²Born
1745¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
10 Feb 176746.1AppointedBishop of Dromore, Ireland
3 May 176746.3Ordained BishopBishop of Dromore, Ireland
7 Apr 177049.2AppointedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
23 Dec 179877.9DiedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Denis Maguire
Bishop Denis Maguire O.F.M. Obs. (born 1721, died ) Bishop of Kilmore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKillesher, Co. Fermanagh
Buried Place (Original)Old, Abbey, Devenish

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 201, and Page 248
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 9
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,634
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Aug 2020

Quantcast