Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel O’Reilly

Deceased

Bishop of Clogher, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1699²Born
Jun 172829.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 174748.6SelectedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
11 Sep 174748.6ConfirmedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
3 Mar 174849.1Ordained BishopBishop of Clogher, Ireland
24 Mar 177879.2DiedBishop of Clogher, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniel O’Reilly
Bishop Daniel O’Reilly (born 1699, died ) Bishop of Clogher

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVirginia, County Cavan
Ordained BishopMalines, Archdiocese of Mechelen, Belgium

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 170
  • bd/bp/d: CB, 11 Mar 2019
  • bd/bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,505

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Aug 2020

Quantcast