Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh O’Reilly

Deceased

Bishop of Clogher, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1724²Born
16 May 177753.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Clogher, Ireland
16 May 177753.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Curium
29 Jul 177753.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Curium
24 Mar 177854.2SucceededBishop of Clogher, Ireland
3 Nov 1801³77.8DiedBishop of Clogher, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugh O’Reilly
Bishop Hugh O’Reilly (born 1724, died ) Bishop of Clogher

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVirginia, County Cavan

  • a bishop for 24.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 170, and Page 189
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 32
  • bp/bd/s: CB, 11 Mar 2019
  • bp/bd/s: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Aug 2020

Quantcast