Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Magauran

Deceased

Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1771¹BornTempleport
1797¹26.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 181544.2AppointedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
27 Aug 181544.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
25 Jun 182958.5DiedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Magauran:
Bishop James Magauran (died ) Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 86
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,716

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013