Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Machín Spiga

Deceased

Bishop of Bosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1699³Born
4 Mar 173030.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Mar 173030.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Sep 174849.2SelectedBishop of Bosa, Italy
2 Dec 174849.4ConfirmedBishop of Bosa, Italy
20 Apr 174949.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
21 Aug 174950.1DiedBishop of Bosa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Machín Spiga
Bishop Giovanni Battista Machín Spiga (born , died ) Bishop of Bosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari
Death PlaceCagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Bosa, Diocese of Bosa

  • a priest for 19.4 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 127
  • ob: CB, 17 Jan 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,044
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 34
  • ob/c2+: AT, 11 Aug 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,471

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018