Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ludovico Emanuele del Carretto

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1710Born
22 Mar 173827.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Apr 173827.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 Sep 174635.8SelectedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
28 Nov 174636.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
29 Jan 174736.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
20 Mar 177261.3DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Emanuele del Carretto
Archbishop Ludovico Emanuele del Carretto (born , died ) Archbishop of Oristano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonreale

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 95
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,474
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,747, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast