Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Pilo, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ales e Terralba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1717BornSassari
25 May 176144.2AppointedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
21 Dec 176144.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
1 Jan 178668.8DiedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Pilo:
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Pilo O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Ales e Terralba

  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,484

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013