Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Luzzi

Deceased

Bishop of Todi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1824Born
29 May 184723.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Sep 184723.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 188258.1AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
2 Apr 188258.1Ordained BishopBishop of Todi, Italy
19 Feb 188864.0DiedBishop of Todi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Luzzi
Bishop Eugenio Luzzi (born , died ) Bishop of Todi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpoleto, Archdiocese of Spoleto
Ordained BishopTor dei Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 571
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017