Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Lomellini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bisceglie, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Aug 1652AppointedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
28 Oct 1652Ordained BishopBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
25 Aug 1657DiedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Lomellini
Bishop Giuseppe Lomellini O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Bisceglie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 369
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1652, Number 31
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,903

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Jan 2019

Quantcast