Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Brendan Leahy

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1960 Born
5 Jun 198626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
10 Jan 201352.7AppointedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
14 Apr 201353.0Ordained BishopBishop of Limerick, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Brendan Leahy (VIAF: 298963906)
Bishop Brendan Leahy (born ) Bishop of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Limerick.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jan 2013
  • ob: CB, 29 Jan 2013
  • c2+: CB, 10 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,763

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017