Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Louis de La Châtre

Deceased

Bishop of Agde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1698BornParis
17 Oct 172628.0SelectedBishop of Agde, France
20 Jan 172728.3ConfirmedBishop of Agde, France
26 Oct 172729.0Ordained BishopBishop of Agde, France
22 May 174041.6DiedBishop of Agde, France

MicroData Summary for Claude-Louis de La Châtre:
Bishop Claude-Louis de La Châtre (born , died ) Bishop of Agde

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015