Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Balbe de Berton de Crillon

Deceased

Archbishop of Vienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1648³BornProvence
21 Feb 167122.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 169749.1SelectedBishop of Vence, France
20 Nov 169749.6ConfirmedBishop of Vence, France
29 Dec 169749.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vence, France
31 Mar 171466.0SelectedArchbishop of Vienne, France
17 Sep 171466.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Vienne, France
30 Oct 172072.6DiedArchbishop of Vienne, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Balbe de Berton de Crillon:
Archbishop François Balbe de Berton de Crillon (born , died ) Archbishop of Vienne

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 407, and Page 415
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015