Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabrice de La Bourdaisière

Deceased

Bishop of Cavaillon


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jan 1624Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 1624AppointedBishop of Cavaillon, France
3 Mar 1624Ordained BishopBishop of Cavaillon, France
13 Jan 1646³DiedBishop of Cavaillon, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabrice de La Bourdaisière:
Bishop Fabrice de La Bourdaisière (died ) Bishop of Cavaillon

  • a priest for 22.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 143
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 83, Number 496

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013