Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume de La Brunetière du Plessis-Gesté

Deceased

Bishop of Saintes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1630Born
165524.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Aug 167645.7SelectedBishop of Saintes, France
30 Aug 167746.7ConfirmedBishop of Saintes, France
30 Nov 167747.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saintes, France
2 May 170271.4DiedBishop of Saintes, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de La Brunetière du Plessis-Gesté
Bishop Guillaume de La Brunetière du Plessis-Gesté (born , died ) Bishop of Saintes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngers

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,677, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast