Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Guy Le Borgne de Kermorvan

Deceased

Bishop of Tréguier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1695BornPleyben Christ, Finistere
13 Feb 174651.0SelectedBishop of Tréguier, France
2 May 174651.3ConfirmedBishop of Tréguier, France
10 Jul 174651.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tréguier, France
30 Sep 176166.7DiedBishop of Tréguier, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Guy Le Borgne de Kermorvan:
Bishop Charles-Guy Le Borgne de Kermorvan (born , died ) Bishop of Tréguier

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 414

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015