Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis La Encina Díaz y Pereiro

Deceased

Bishop of Arequipa, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1754Born
9 Sep 180550.9AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
28 Sep 180652.0Ordained BishopBishop of Arequipa, Peru
16 Jan 181661.3DiedBishop of Arequipa, Peru

MicroData Summary for Luis La Encina Díaz y Pereiro
Bishop Luis La Encina Díaz y Pereiro (born , died ) Bishop of Arequipa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLas Palmas, Spain

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1806, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 87
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 126, Number 672

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018