Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Krautmann

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Knin (Tinin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1789Born
21 Dec 181122.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 May 181222.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 185262.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
15 Mar 185262.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
30 May 185262.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
1 Jul 185565.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Krautmann
Bishop József Krautmann (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeczkó
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 554
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 24
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,856

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast