Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Kraly

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

Titular Bishop of Lycopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1792Born
30 May 181523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb, Croatia
16 Nov 185462.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
16 Nov 185462.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
6 May 185562.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
1883¹90.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joannes Kraly
Bishop Joannes Kraly (born , died 1883) Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVarast, Archdiocese of Zagreb
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb

  • a priest for 67.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 355
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 28 Dec 2016