Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccola Kováts de Csil-Tusnad

Deceased

Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1769Born
15 Jun 179425.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Jun 179425.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 May 182758.3SelectedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
28 Jan 182859.0ConfirmedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
25 Mar 182859.1Ordained BishopBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
15 Oct 185283.7DiedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania

MicroData Summary for Niccola Kováts de Csil-Tusnad
Bishop Niccola Kováts de Csil-Tusnad (born , died ) Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTusnád

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 374
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018