Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Brendan Kelly

Bishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1946 Born
20 Jun 197125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
20 Nov 200761.5AppointedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
27 Jan 200861.6Ordained BishopBishop of Achonry, Ireland
11 Dec 201771.5AppointedBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
11 Feb 201871.7InstalledBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Brendan Kelly
Bishop Brendan Kelly (born ) Bishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallinakill
Ordained BishopAnnunciation and Saint Nathy, Cathedral, Ballaghaderreen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Galway and Kilmacduagh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,666
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Dec 2017
  • i: CB, 13 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast