Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Jezzoni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valva e Sulmona

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1860BornMutignano
6 Dec 190646.6AppointedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
16 Dec 190646.6Ordained BishopBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
18 Jul 193676.2RetiredBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
18 Jul 193676.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
2 May 193878.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Valva e Sulmona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Jezzoni:
Bishop Nicola Jezzoni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Valva e Sulmona

  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013