Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspard-Jean-André Jauffret

Deceased

Bishop of Metz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1759BornLa Roquebrussanne
16 Jul 180646.5SelectedBishop of Metz, France
26 Aug 180646.7ConfirmedBishop of Metz, France
8 Dec 180646.9Ordained BishopBishop of Metz, France
12 May 182363.4DiedBishop of Metz, France

MicroData Summary for Gaspard-Jean-André Jauffret:
Bishop Gaspard-Jean-André Jauffret (born , died ) Bishop of Metz

  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 263
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1806, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015