Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Giustino Sebastiano Pasquale de Jacobis, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Abyssinia

Titular Bishop of Nilopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1800BornSan Fele, Italy
12 Jun 182423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
10 Mar 183938.4AppointedPrefect of Abyssinia, Ethiopia
6 Jul 184746.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
6 Jul 184746.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Abyssinia, Ethiopia
7 Jan 184948.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
31 Jul 186059.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Abyssinia, Ethiopia
25 Jun 1939Beatified
26 Oct 1975Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Giustino Sebastiano Pasquale de Jacobis (VIAF: 37783771)
Bishop St. Giustino Sebastiano Pasquale de Jacobis C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Abyssinia

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 415
  • beat: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 31, Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1849, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Dec 2016