Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Herrera Bárcena, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1706BornAñozos
1 Mar 177972.3AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
25 Apr 177972.4Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
4 Dec 178377.1DiedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Herrera Bárcena:
Bishop Joaquín Herrera Bárcena O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 95, Number 489
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015