Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Gregory Hagi (Hadjian)

Deceased

Bishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1801¹BornConstantinople
30 Jun 183029.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 185049.3AppointedBishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)
7 Jul 185049.5Ordained BishopBishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)
9 Oct 185352.7DiedBishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gregory Hagi (Hadjian)
Bishop Joseph Gregory Hagi (Hadjian) (born 1801, died ) Bishop of Erzerum (Garin)

  • a priest for 23.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 263
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1850, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016