Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Gozzadini

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalonia e Zante


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Mar 1654AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
22 Mar 1654Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
16 Feb 1673DiedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gozzadini:
Bishop Francesco Gozzadini (died ) Bishop of Cefalonia e Zante

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 116, Number 711
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 145

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013