Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomé González y Poveda

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1635²Born
9 Apr 168550.2AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
2 Jun 1686³51.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
26 Nov 169257.9DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé González y Poveda
Archbishop Bartolomé González y Poveda (born 1635, died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlmería, Spain

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 317
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,853
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 227, Number 1,409
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018