Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guglielmo Giustini

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1846Born
18 Dec 186923.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 189852.1AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
25 Mar 189852.1Ordained BishopBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
27 Apr 190357.2DiedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Giustini
Bishop Guglielmo Giustini (born , died ) Bishop of Recanati e Loreto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSenigallia, Diocese of Senigallia
Ordained BishopSacro Cuore di Gesù a Castro Pretorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 478
  • c2: CB, 7 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: CB, 5 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,755
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017