Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Ghiurekian

Deceased

Bishop of Trabzon (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1798Born
13 Jul 182324.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 186566.2AppointedBishop of Trabzon (Armenian), Turkey
20 May 186566.4Ordained BishopBishop of Trabzon (Armenian), Turkey
30 Aug 187475.6DiedBishop of Trabzon (Armenian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Ghiurekian
Bishop Giovanni Battista Ghiurekian (born , died ) Bishop of Trabzon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrabzon, Diocese of Trabzon (Armenian)

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 562
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1865, Number 14
  • c2: CB, 3 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Mar 2017