Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Gentili

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹BornFoligno
24 Mar 164245.2AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
30 Mar 164245.2Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
3 Dec 164649.9ResignedBishop of Anagni, Italy
29 May 165659.4AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
3 Aug 166770.6ResignedBishop of Terni, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Gentili:
Bishop Sebastiano Gentili Bishop Emeritus of Terni

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 82, and Page 210
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 106, Number 646

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013