Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Gelli

Deceased

Bishop of Volterra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1821Born
8 Mar 184523.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 188260.3AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
2 Apr 188260.3Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
2 Mar 190987.3DiedBishop of Volterra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Gelli (VIAF: 89139491)
Bishop Giuseppe Gelli (born , died ) Bishop of Volterra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucca, Archdiocese of Lucca
Ordained BishopTor de Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 595
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017