Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín Garnica

Deceased

Bishop of Osma, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Apr 1594AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
5 Jul 1594³Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
20 Nov 1594DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martín Garnica
Bishop Martín Garnica (died ) Bishop of Osma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlmagro, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,089
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 106, Number 672
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1594, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018