Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Gargiulo

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Thyatira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1778Born
20 Dec 180022.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 184365.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thyatira
9 Jul 184365.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thyatira
25 Dec 184567.7DiedTitular Bishop of Thyatira

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Gargiulo
Bishop Francesco Saverio Gargiulo (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Thyatira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Ordained BishopGesu’ Vecchio, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Nuovo Campo Santo, Cemetery, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 368
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 36
  • ob/c2+: AT, 16 Jun 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,734

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast