Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Foschi

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1711BornCajazzo
4 Jun 173524.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 175948.2AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
4 Jun 175948.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
15 Nov 177665.6DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Foschi:
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Foschi (born , died ) Bishop of Lucera

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013