Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Fogliani

Deceased

Bishop of Modena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1654³Born
19 Sep 167722.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Sep 167722.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Apr 171762.5AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
25 Apr 171762.5Ordained BishopBishop of Modena, Italy
26 Jun 174287.7DiedBishop of Modena, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Fogliani
Bishop Stefano Fogliani (born , died ) Bishop of Modena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastri Novi Montibus

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 277

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018