Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Falvo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marsico Nuovo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1612Born
9 Apr 163926.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 167159.4AppointedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
22 Nov 167159.4Ordained BishopBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
1 Jan 167663.5DiedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Falvo
Bishop Giovanni Battista Falvo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Marsico Nuovo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMotta Santa Lucia (Martirano)

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1671, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018