Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Falconi

Deceased

Bishop of Caiazzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1665BornCivitate Ducali
15 Mar 171145.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 171852.5AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
3 Apr 171852.6Ordained BishopBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
28 Aug 172762.0DiedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Falconi:
Bishop Giacomo Falconi (died ) Bishop of Caiazzo

  • a priest for 16.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013