Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Facciotti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ferentino, Italy

Titular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae

Titular Archbishop of Chalcis in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1823Born
19 Sep 184623.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 187955.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palestrina, Italy
28 Feb 187955.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
9 Mar 187955.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
27 Jan 1880²56.5AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
19 Apr 189773.8ResignedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
19 Apr 189773.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcis in Syria
20 Apr 191389.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Ferentino, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Facciotti (VIAF: 88821585)
Archbishop Pietro Facciotti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ferentino

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalestrina, Suburbicarian See of Palestrina
Ordained BishopSte Marie del anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 66.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 69, and Page 198
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1879, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Mar 2017