Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tiberio Durante

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1837Born
22 Sep 186023.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 188245.1AppointedBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
1 Oct 188245.1Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
31 Oct 189962.2DiedBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tiberio Durante (VIAF: 307369274)
Bishop Tiberio Durante (born , died ) Bishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBovino, Diocese of Bovino
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 369
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017