Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bl. Jean-Marie du Lau d’Allemans

Deceased

Archbishop of Arles, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1738Born
26 Feb 177536.3SelectedArchbishop of Arles, France
24 Apr 177536.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Arles, France
1 Oct 177536.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Arles, France
2 Sep 179253.8DiedArchbishop of Arles, France
17 Oct 1926Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Jean-Marie du Lau d’Allemans
Archbishop Bl. Jean-Marie du Lau d’Allemans (born , died ) Archbishop of Arles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiras

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 97
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018