Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Di Stefano, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Moldavia

Titular Bishop of Benda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1808BornCicciano, Italy
28 Aug 184940.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Moldavia
28 Aug 184940.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Benda
30 Nov 184940.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Benda
27 Nov 185950.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Moldavia
1 Nov 189384.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Moldavia

MicroData Summary for Antonio Di Stefano
Bishop Antonio Di Stefano O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Moldavia

  • a bishop for 43.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1894
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 146
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1849, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016