Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maciej Drzewiecki

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1467Born
21 Oct 150437.6ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
11 Jan 150537.8Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
4 Nov 151346.7AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
4 Aug 153164.4AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
22 Aug 153568.5DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Maciej Drzewiecki
Archbishop Maciej Drzewiecki (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrzewica

  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 336, and Page 204
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 279
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,920

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018