Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafał Leszczyński

Deceased

Bishop of Płock, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1480¹Born
1520¹40.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jan 152141.0AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
8 Jun 152343.4AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
11 Sep 152444.6Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
24 Mar 152747.2DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rafał Leszczyński
Bishop Rafał Leszczyński (born 1480, died ) Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Płock, Diocese of Płock

  • a priest for 7.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 276, and Page 279
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,914
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1524, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast