Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomeo Flores

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cosenza


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Aug 1489AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
8 Sep 1489Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
5 Aug 1495AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
1497¹ResignedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
23 Jul 1498DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cosenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Flores:
Archbishop Bartolomeo Flores (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cosenza

  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 244, and Page 142
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,414

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013