Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Isvales

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana

Cardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane

Administrator of Messina

Administrator of Orense

Administrator of Veszprém


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Feb 1497AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
4 Jun 1497Ordained BishopArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
28 Sep 1500Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 1500InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
21 Jun 1503AppointedAdministrator of Veszprém, Hungary
24 Jul 1506ResignedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
18 Aug 1507AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
7 Jun 1508AppointedAdministrator of Orense, Spain
1510AppointedAdministrator of Messina, Italy
22 Sep 1511DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana

MicroData Summary for Pietro Isvales:
Pietro Cardinal Isvales (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
  • a cardinal for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Sep 1500
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 222
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 312, Number 210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015