Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Garcia

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jul 1484AppointedBishop of Ales (Uselli), Italy
14 Jun 1490AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
8 Feb 1505DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Garcia
Bishop Pedro Garcia (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 261, and Page 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018