Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Vasseur, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Thérouanne, France

Titular Bishop of Dschebail


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jan 1488AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Thérouanne, France
30 Jan 1488AppointedTitular Bishop of Dschebail
17 Feb 1488Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dschebail
18 Jan 1508DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Thérouanne, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Vasseur
Bishop Jean Vasseur O.P. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Thérouanne

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria sopra Minerva, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 159
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,410
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,488, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast