Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco de Noya, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cefal¨


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Nov 1484AppointedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
6 Aug 1485Ordained BishopBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
18 Apr 1492DiedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco de Noya:
Bishop Francesco de Noya O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Cefal¨

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 125
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,404
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 310, Number 201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015